Team Leader
- Lutz Straßburger (DR Inria)
Project Assistant
- Bahar Carabetta (bahar dot carabetta at inria dot fr)
Permanent researchers
- Beniamino Accattoli (CR Inria)
- Kaustuv Chaudhuri (CR Inria)
- Ian Mackie (CR CNRS)
- Dale Miller (DR Inria)
- Gabriel Scherer (CR Inria)
- Noam Zeilberger (Polytechnique)
- Benjamin Werner (Polytechnique)
PhD students
- Matteo Manighetti (since 1 Oct 2017, supervised by Dale Miller)
- Nicolas Blanco (since 1 Oct 2018, supervised by Paul Levy and Noam Zeilberger)
- Alexandros Singh (since 1 Oct 2019, supervised by Olivier Bodini and Noam Zeilberger)
- Marianela Morales (since 1 Oct 2019, supervised by Lutz Straßburger)
- Emilie Grienenberger (since 1 Oct 2019, supervised by Gilles Dowek and Dale Miller)
- Wendlasida Ouedraogo (since 1 Nov 2019, CIFRE, supervised by Danko Ilik and Lutz Straßburger)
- Olivier Martinot (since 1 Sep 2020, supervised by Gabriel Scherer)
- Giti Omidvar (since 1 Oct 2020, supervised by Lutz Straßburger)
- Jui-Hsuan Wu (since 1 Oct 2021, supervised by Dale Miller)
- Farah Al Wardani (since 1 Oct 2021, supervised by Dale Miller)
- Pablo Donato (supervised by Benjamin Werner)
- Antoine Séré (supervised by Benjamin Werner)
————————————–
Former Team Members
Permanent researchers
- François Lamarche (DR Inria, retired 31 Dec 2020)
Research Engineers
- Matteo Acclavio (1 Dec 2019 – 31 May 2020, supervised by Guillaume Burel, Kaustuv Chaudhuri and Dale Miller)
Post Docs
- Luc Pellissier (1 Nov 2019 – 31 Aug 2020, supervised by Gabriel Scherer)
- Marianna Girlando (1 Nov 2019 – 28 Feb 2021, supervised by Lutz Straßburger)
PhD students
- Maico Leberle (1 Oct 2017 – 31 Jan 2021, defended in May 2021, supervised by Beniamino Accattoli)
Interns and short-terms visitors
- Giti Omidvar (Stage M2, 9 Mar 2020 – 31 Aug 2020, supervised by Lutz Straßburger)
- Jui-Hsuan Wu (Stage M2, 1 Apr 2020 – 31 Aug 2020, supervised by Lutz Straßburger)
- Olivier Martinot (Stage M2, 1 Apr 2020 – 31 Aug 2020, supervised by Gabriel Scherer)
- Nicolas Blanco (PhD visitor from Birmingham, 1 Oct 2020 – 31 Nov 2020, supervised by Noam Zeilberger)
- Nicolas Chataing (Stage M2, 1 Mar 2021 – 31 Aug 2021, supervised by Gabriel Scherer)
- Maxime Legoupil (Stage M2, 1 Mar 2021 – 31 Aug 2021, supervised by Gabriel Scherer)
- Maxime Vemclefs (Stage M2, 1 May 2021 – 31 Aug 2021, supervised by Beniamino Accattoli)